Trustees PORLOCK RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 1176921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Suzanne Adlington Trustee 18 February 2025
None on record
Denys Lyons Trustee 16 April 2024
None on record
Richard Jonathon Crompton Maw Trustee 25 October 2022
None on record
Philip Anthony Kenward Trustee 25 October 2022
None on record
Jayson Horne Trustee 25 October 2022
None on record
Duncan McCanlis Trustee 19 April 2022
None on record
Lesley Ann Thornton Trustee 19 April 2022
None on record
Sue McCanlis Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record
Ian Fraser Trustee 04 September 2018
None on record
NORA MAW Trustee 04 September 2018
None on record
MRS TERRY GABLE Trustee 01 February 2018
None on record