CHOOSE LOVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In both emergency disaster relief and protracted crises, Choose Love works to identify, close and prevent gaps in support displaced people around the world. We provide grants and other assistance to frontline partners along key migration routes and in countries experiencing conflict, persecution climate change and other drivers of forced displacement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Austria
- Belgium
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Brazil
- Canada
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Egypt
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hungary
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Jordan
- Moldova
- Morocco
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Poland
- Romania
- Serbia
- Switzerland
- Turkey
- United States
Governance
- 12 April 2018: CIO registration
- HELP REFUGEES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Cordell | Chair | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julfikhar Farhaz Khan KC | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
EYINMISAN HOPE HARRIMAN | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dzikamai Jonathan Chibafa | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Purkis | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Hassan Elmasry | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Segal KC | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Jessica Mills | Trustee | 21 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Seaward | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £41.80k | £85.71k | £62.13k | £304.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £83.43k | £0 | £347.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 12 APR 2018 AS AMENDED ON 07 MAR 2024 AMENDED ON 19 SEP 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY, PHYSICAL AND MENTAL ILL-HEALTH, AND DISTRESS OF PERSONS WHO ARE ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED OF HUMANITARIAN AID (INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION INTERNALLY DISPLACED, VULNERABLE MIGRANTS AND PEOPLE WHO ARE OTHERWISE FLEEING WAR, PERSECUTION, FAMINE OR NATURAL DISASTER) WHEREVER THEY ARE IN THE WORLD. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED OF HUMANITARIAN AID (INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION INTERNALLY DISPLACED, VULNERABLE MIGRANTS AND PEOPLE WHO ARE OTHERWISE FLEEING WAR, PERSECUTION, FAMINE OR NATURAL DISASTER) WHEREVER THEY ARE IN THE WORLD; AND TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT THE POSITION OF REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS AND MIGRANTS AND THE SITUATIONS WHICH GIVE RISE TO THEIR MOVEMENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Provost St
Office 2
London
N1 7NH
- Phone:
- 07932374419
- Email:
- josie@choose.love
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window