THE MANDY FISHER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise funds by way of sponsored events, and participation events, such as Quizes and Bridge evenings, for the specific support of 3 charities; The North London Hospice, Ovarian Cancer Research at the Oxford University, and Singing for Memories run by Jewish Care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Buckinghamshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Kent
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR R GASTMAN | Chair | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR J JOSEPH | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.38k | £368 | £0 | £0 | £3.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.38k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 April 2023 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SELECT FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES; AND FOR THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; THROUGH THE RAISING OF, AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS OPERATING THROUGHOUT LONDON, THE HOME COUNTIES, AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 OAKLANDS ROAD
LONDON
N20 8BD
- Phone:
- 077128659069
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window