INDIAN CULTURAL ASSOCIATION OF DORSET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
What the charity does: General charitable purposes Religious activities Arts/culture/heritage/science Human rights/religious or racial harmony/equality or diversity Other charitable purposes How the charity works Provides buildings/facilities/open space Provides services Provides advocacy/advice/information Acts as an umbrella or resource body
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 June 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 30 November 2017: CIO registration
- ICAD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prashant Bhatia | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amit Baswal | Trustee | 19 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vamsi Krishna Jagadapi Sudhakar | Trustee | 19 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Prabhakar Makarahalli | Trustee | 02 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anup Shenoy | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
KIRAN CHANNABASAPPA | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr JAGANNADHA PAWAN TAMVADA | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr LINGESWARI BIRNIE | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/06/2019 | 01/06/2020 | 01/06/2021 | 01/06/2022 | 01/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.12k | £6.52k | £871 | £1.10k | £5.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.23k | £7.45k | £615 | £596 | £9.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Annual return | 01 June 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ICAD IS TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE INDIAN CULTURE THROUGH ART FORMS, MUSIC, DANCE, YOGA, LITERATURE, MEDITATION AND SPIRITUAL LIVING AND TO ADVANCE THE RELIGIONS OF INDIAN ORIGIN (HINDUISM, SIKHISM, BUDDHISM, AND JAINISM) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT (BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE) THE ICAD MAY: A) ACT AS A SPIRITUAL CENTER FOR INDIVIDUALS FROM ALL COMMUNITIES AND RELIGIOUS BACKGROUNDS, PARTICULARLY OF INDIA ORIGIN B) ACT AS A CENTER FOR INTEGRATION AND PROMOTION OF PEACEFUL CO-EXISTENCE OF INDIVIDUALS FROM MULTIPLE CULTURAL AND RELIGIOUS BACKGROUNDS C) BE A CENTER FOR EXCHANGE OF CULTURAL AND SPIRITUAL IDEAS ORIGINATING FROM INDIA AND FROM ALL OVER THE WORLD. D) PROVIDE COMMUNITY SERVICE THROUGH VOLUNTARY SERVICE INITIATIVES IN THE FIELDS OF HEALTH, EDUCATION, ENVIRONMENT AND OTHER FIELDS E) SERVE AS A CENTER FOR DEVELOPING IDEAS FOR HOLISTIC LIVING F) SERVE AS A MEETING POINT FOR INDIVIDUALS INTERESTED IN INDIAN CULTURE AND RELIGIONS G) ORGANIZE EVENTS TO BRING TOGETHER INDIVIDUALS FOR CELEBRATING INDIAN FESTIVALS AND NATIONAL OCCASIONS. 2 H) INVITE AND HOST DISTINGUISHED INDIVIDUALS TO PROMOTE CULTURAL EXCHANGE AND PHILOSOPHICAL THOUGHT I) UNDERSTAND AND ADVANCE THE STUDY OF VEDIC TEACHINGS AND PHILOSOPHICAL THOUGHT J) PROMOTE THE STUDY THE LIVES OF SPIRITUAL LEADERS, SAINTS AND SAGES OF INDIA AND BEYOND K) RAISE FUNDS AND INVITE AND RECEIVE CONTRIBUTIONS FROM ANY PERSON OR PERSONS WHO WHATSOEVER BY WAY OF SUBSCRIPTION, DONATION AND OTHERWISE, PROVIDED THAT THE ICAD SHALL NOT UNDERTAKE ANY PERMANENT TRADING ACTIVITIES IN RAISING THE FUNDS FOR ITS OBJECT L) PROVIDE A PLACE OF WORSHIP FOR INDIVIDUALS OF INDIAN ORIGIN, IN PARTICULAR HINDUS, SIKHS, BUDDHISTS AND JAINS. M) PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RELIGIOUS, SOCIAL AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES N) PERFORM ALL SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES AS SHALL FURTHER THE OBJECT NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE ICAD FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 East Avenue
BOURNEMOUTH
BH3 7DB
- Phone:
- 07440748616
- Email:
- trustee@icad.org.uk
- Website:
-
icad.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window