THE PHOTOGRAPHIC VOICE (NORTH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work in partnership with other organisations in the North East of England with the aim of providing opportunities for our communities to represent themselves and tell their own story. We do this by providing training and education in photography, other visual media and communication to enable people facing any disadvantage to develop their individual capabilities; skills; and knowledge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joe Hunt | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Nicholas Kitchener | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Kitchener | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.75k | £50 | £281 | £133 | £523 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING TRAINING IN PHOTOGRAPHY, OTHER VISUAL MEDIA, AND COMMUNICATION TO ENABLE PEOPLE FACING DISADVANTAGE TO DEVELOP THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES; SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE; TO BUILD RESILIENCE AND FIND THEIR OWN CREATIVE VOICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 Tenby Road
REDCAR
TS10 4GZ
- Phone:
- 08002461401
- Email:
- photographicvoice@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window