KENT SRI LANKAN BUDDHIST CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1176744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The trustees of Kent Sri Lankan Buddhist Cultural Centre plan to carry out the purposes of our organisation by performing/facilitating the following: a) Providing a place of worship b) Organising a venue and other facilities needed to hold religious discussions and sermons c) Organising meditation sessions including arranging other facilities for those sessions. d) Organising Buddhist festival

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £802
Total expenditure: £5,771

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 January 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Chandrasekara Mudalige Cyril Randeniya Trustee 03 February 2020
None on record
ASANKA DE SILVA BALASURIYA Trustee 08 July 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.84k £4.40k £1.51k £820 £802
Total expenditure £0 £502 £20 £1 £5.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 November 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 November 2021 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
22 JAMES ROAD
DARTFORD
DA1 3NF
Phone:
07405508128
Website:

No information available