INK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving a voice to those that are rarely heard by inspiring, nurturing and developing skills to create short new plays for the widest possible audiences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 November 2017: CIO registration
- INK ( FROM PEN TO PERFORMANCE) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul John Schlesinger | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Mary Berry | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Newill | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Warren Franklin | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN ANDREW MURPHY | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Gildon | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Elder | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Courtenay Trewin | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY MACKINTOSH | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julia Rosalind Sowerbutts | Trustee | 10 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.48k | £80.34k | £44.94k | £113.34k | £132.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.34k | £33.76k | £32.37k | £129.32k | £137.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £1.00k | N/A | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2017 as amended on 17 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:- 1)ENCOURAGING AND NURTURING THE WRITING OF NEW SHORT SCRIPTS FOR STAGE, RADIO AND FILM BY EMERGING AND ESTABLISHED WRITERS OF ALL AGES WITH AN EAST ANGLIAN CONNECTION, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS; 2)DEVELOPING SELECTED SCRIPTS INTO FULLER PLAYS; 3)PROVIDING AFFORDABLE LOCAL ACCESS TO NEW DRAMA AND TO RAISE AWARENESS OF THE PERFORMING ARTS IN EAST ANGLIA; 4)ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN DRAMA; 5)SUPPORTING THE CUT PERFORMING ARTS THEATRE, HALESWORTH, SUFFOLK, AND OTHER LIKE VENUES IN THEIR ROLE IN BRINGING PERFORMING ARTS TO THE COMMUNITY; AND 6)HOLDING AN ANNUAL INK FESTIVAL WEEKEND AND OTHER EVENTS TO PROVIDE A PERFORMANCE PLATFORM FOR NEW THEATRE, FILM, RADIO AND POETRY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
INK Spot
Unit 10
The Cut Arts Centre
8 New Cut
Halesworth
Suffolk
- Phone:
- 01986 872555
- Email:
- info@inkfestival.org
- Website:
-
inkfestival.org/
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window