Financial history CRAWLEY COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity Number: 1174869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £278.60k £300.58k £173.88k £233.53k £340.26k
Total expenditure £191.88k £354.90k £232.88k £247.06k £275.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £26.21k £24.05k N/A N/A