CRAWLEY COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian religion and to carry out other charitable works. We continue to carry out activities, local and further afield, in order to achieve these activities we have weekly meetings of Christian Worship & Teaching, weekly events for Youth and Children, Support for missionary bodies locally and internationally along with charitable support to humanitarian crises on an ad hoc basis
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Willows | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Victoria Margaret Revelle | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Ells | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £278.60k | £300.58k | £173.88k | £233.53k | £340.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £191.88k | £354.90k | £232.88k | £247.06k | £275.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.21k | £24.05k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND IN SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crawley Community Church
West Green Drive
CRAWLEY
West Sussex
RH11 7EL
- Phone:
- 01293561933
- Email:
- Hello@lovecrawley.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window