Financial history CREWE RIFLE AND PISTOL CLUB

Charity number: 510759
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £106.03k £38.75k £53.29k £69.53k £74.54k
Total expenditure £136.24k £46.84k £56.58k £64.76k £71.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £70.00k £11.37k N/A N/A N/A