WE STAND TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Events, dialogues & workshops for people to come together, better understand diverse identities, reduce prejudice, promote inclusivity & challenge discrimination At times of tension, bring diverse groups together to promote peaceful coexistence & challenge those seeking to divide communities Research & training to improve understanding & relationships of 9 protected Equality Act characteristics
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 November 2017: CIO registration
- #WESTANDTOGETHER (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Erinma Bell | Chair | 04 September 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||
Robin Graham | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||
Damian Peter Carr | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Mandip Singh Atwal | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
QAISRA SHAHRAZ | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
Mohammed Ali | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
Peter Fahy | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||
MOHAMMED REHMAN ULLAH | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.98k | £43.22k | £517 | £2.52k | £31.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.83k | £1.86k | £23.96k | £21.23k | £16.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £375 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 March 2021 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 March 2021 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Nov 2017 as amended on 26 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE, MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT BETWEEN COMMUNITIES; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT THE NINE PROTECTED CHARACTERISTICS UNDER THE EQUALITY ACT 2010 TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT GROUPS; (C) WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON ALL GROUNDS; (D) PROMOTING GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN DIFFERENT GROUPS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Crumpsall Community Hall
Cleveland Rd
Manchester
M8 4QU
- Phone:
- 07930 534422
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window