WINDSOR & ETON ROTARY CHARITY

Charity number: 1174335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of the poor and needy or for the benefit of other charitable institutions, societies and objects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £11,496
Total expenditure: £9,058

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Windsor And Maidenhead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 August 2017: CIO registration
  • 24 July 2018: Funds received from 1001549 ROTARY CLUB OF WINDSOR AND ETON BENEVOLENT FUND
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GUY JONATHAN BARLOW Trustee 01 July 2024
THE GILLMOR MEMORIAL BENEVOLENT FUND UNDER THE DIRECTION OF THE PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE OF BERKSHIRE
Received: On time
THE BERKSHIRE MASONIC CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
Philip Anthony Reynolds Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Ronald William Lewandowski Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Dan Paul Andreianu Trustee 01 July 2023
TREVELYAN MIDDLE SCHOOL PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
DAVID FRANCIS OSMOND Trustee 22 August 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £70.68k £15.01k £22.23k £15.72k £11.50k
Total expenditure £53.70k £27.79k £30.30k £9.58k £9.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 28 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 28 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 22 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 22 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 22 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 22 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 29 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 15 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Langleigh
Colliers Lane
Peppard Common
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
Oxfordshire
RG9 5LT
Phone:
01491628522
Website:

No information available