HERE FOR GOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Free immigration services for vulnerable migrants living in the UK and their family members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £54,862 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul David Dossett | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
TAHMID RAHMAN CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|||||
KIM DENISE HOOPER | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.42k | £252.21k | £250.46k | £361.11k | £218.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.35k | £248.16k | £241.31k | £295.82k | £308.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.14k | £32.62k | £46.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.94k | £109.24k | £135.55k | £167.87k | £54.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 31 December 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 29 December 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 20 April 2022 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Feb 2018 as amended on 06 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
1 To relieve the needs of migrants experiencing issues with their uk immigration status by providing such persons with free, high quality legal services which they could not otherwise obtain through lack of means or provision of legal aid; 2 The relief and assistance of people who are the victims of war, natural disaster or climate change, trouble or catastrophe, in particular by the supply of legal services and ancillary assistance to such persons seeking refuge in the uk; and 3 To advance such other charitable purposes as the directors at their absolute discretion may from time to time determine.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 CROSBY WALK
LONDON
E8 3DW
- Phone:
- 07464758165
- Email:
- contact@hereforgoodlaw.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window