Financial history CULPEPER COMMUNITY GARDEN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1176277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £62.39k £64.26k £97.80k £72.74k £72.53k
Total expenditure £61.51k £55.38k £87.95k £92.60k £84.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.50k £3.54k £36.30k £16.94k £16.47k