LLANDAFF 50+

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Llandaff 50+ supports older people. We promote social inclusion among people over 50 in Llandaff who no longer feel included in society as a result of the issues that arise from old age. We provide facilities for social interaction and recreation, and opportunities for volunteering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
Governance
- 07 December 2017: CIO registration
- PREVIOUSLY KNOWN AS INSOLE COURT 50+ (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILLIAN MATTHEWS | Chair | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ann Eleri Jones | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Scantlebury | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Merrifield | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Sean Driscoll | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Kenyon | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jan Joynson | Trustee | 31 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Harry | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lillias French | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.75k | £76.91k | £11.44k | £11.03k | £12.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.49k | £17.65k | £32.67k | £11.31k | £10.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.65k | £50.25k | £2.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG PERSONS OVER 50 IN LLANDAFF WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY AS A RESULT OF THE CONDITIONS THAT ARISE FROM OLD AGE BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THEIR SOCIAL INTERACTION AND RECREATION AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR VOLUNTEERING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Pound
2 Cathedral Close
CARDIFF
CF5 2ED
- Phone:
- 0775 8939 141
- Email:
- info@llandaff50plus.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window