CHABAD ON THE SOUTH BANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Jewish religion and education of the public in the religion of Judaism in particular but not exclusively through the holding of prayer meetings, public celebration of religious festivals, providing educational programmes and producing and/or distributing literature on Judaism. Relief of poverty through the provision of financial support and coordination of practical support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
- Southwark
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 05 January 2018: Standard registration
- CHABAD OF BATTERSEA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL DUBOY | Chair | 02 July 2017 |
|
|||||
BENTZION ALPEROWITZ | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
MENACHEM MENDEL RASKIN | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.51k | £81.16k | £131.56k | £114.57k | £232.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.65k | £69.59k | £127.47k | £130.40k | £169.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE JEWISH RELIGION IN LONDON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON JUDAISM TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE JEWISH RELIGION. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE RELIGION OF JUDAISM, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, HEALTH, AND DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT AND COORDINATION OF PRACTICAL SUPPORT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE THAT ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
105 Eade Road
OCC Building A
2nd Floor Unit 11D
N4 1TJ
- Phone:
- +44 20 3198 9784
- Email:
- info@jewishbattersea.com
- Website:
-
jewishbattersea.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window