THE THWAITE MILLS SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a"frends" organisation which supports the physical development of Thwaite Mills, a water mill on the River Aire at stourton, Leeds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leeds City
Governance
- 02 December 1980: Standard registration
- 27 January 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2006 | 31/05/2007 | 31/05/2008 | 31/05/2009 | 31/05/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.89k | £5.96k | £6.44k | £5.81k | £844 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.18k | £47.81k | £516 | £1.50k | £8.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2010 | 13 September 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2009 | 14 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2008 | 05 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAY 1980 AS AMENDED 10 NOVEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ENCOURAGING, PROMOTING AND UNDERTAKING THE PRESERVATION OF THE THWAITE MILLS SITUATED AT STOURTON IN THE CITY OF LEEDS METROPOLITAN DISTRICT AS AN INDUSTRIAL MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window