BEDWORTH AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 02 December 1980: Standard registration
- 12 July 2005: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 12 July 2005: Funds transferred to 1103630 BEDWORTH, RUGBY AND NUNEATON CITIZENS ADVICE BUREA...
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 06 July 2005 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 06 July 2005 | 156 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEPTEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 19 OCTOBER 1981 AS AMENDED 7 JULY 1986
Charitable objects
THE BUREAU IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN BEDWORTH AND DISTRICT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
BEDWORTH AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window