THE DR SEYMOUR COLE WILL TRUST CHARITY FOR THE CARE OF DOGS AND HORSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to provide charitable funds for the care of dogs and horses by granting aid to charities who carry out that work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 September 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CLIVE SUTTON | Chair | 08 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL EDALAT | Trustee | 08 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.43k | £1.88k | £939 | £241 | £266 | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.50k | £3.56k | £27.39k | £3.57k | £1.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 01 October 2021 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED ON 13 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
TO HOLD THE SAME ON CHARITABLE TRUSTS INCLUDING CHARITABLE TRUSTS IF THEY DEEM FIT WITH THE PURPOSE OF BENEFITING SUCH CHARITIES AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE HAVING AS THEIR OBJECT THE CARE OF DOGS AND HORSES WITH THE FURTHER OBJECT OF ALLEVIATING ANIMAL SUFFERING IN ANY FORM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLIVE SUTTON SOLICITORS
UNIT 3
85B HIGH STREET
LYMINGTON
SO41 9AN
- Phone:
- 01590672595
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window