Accounts and annual returns LUDCHURCH VILLAGE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1174902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2024 18 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2024 18 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2023 06 August 2024 187 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 06 August 2024 187 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2022 09 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 09 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2021 21 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 21 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 26 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 26 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window