VINTAGE CARRIAGES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation, restoration, maintaining and interpretation, by display and controlled use, of railway carriages, locomotives and other items.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
Governance
- 14 January 1981: Standard registration
- MUSEUM OF RAIL TRAVEL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR T ENGLAND | Chair |
|
||||||
Robert Sprot | Trustee | 18 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA ANN SEABROOK | Trustee | 15 October 2011 |
|
|||||
IAN BARRY SMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID NORMAN CARR | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTIONADOPTED 26 JULY 1974 AS AMENDED 4 OCTOBER 1980 AS AMENDED 13 MARCH 1988
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH A RAILWAY MUSEUM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vintage Carriages Trust
Railway Station
Station Road
Haworth
Keighley
BD22 8NJ
- Phone:
- 01535680425
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window