WOLVERHAMPTON CARAVAN PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 01 February 1982: Standard registration
- 23 August 1989: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JANUARY 1982 AS AMENDED 21 APRIL 1983 AND 9 SEPT. 1986.
Charitable objects
SHALL BE THE PROVISION IN THE BOROUGH OF WOLVHAMPTON OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN BEING FACILITIES. A OF WHICH SUCH CHILDREN HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCE; B WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL SPRIRITUAL AND MENTAL WELL-BEING.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF WOLVERHAMPTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.