DACHSHUND HEALTH UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DHUK operates in the UK. We make grants to individuals and organisations. We provide advocacy / advice / information and sponsor or undertake research. We educate the public in the care and treatment of dachshunds and promoting humane behaviour towards dachshunds. We research into diseases and hereditary disorders of dachshunds and disseminate the use of this research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 March 2018: CIO registration
- DACHSHUND BREED COUNCIL HEALTH FUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Seath | Chair | 02 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thomas Whitfield-Roberts | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Michaela Dance | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Jane Patton | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Thomas Roberts | Trustee | 15 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Alton | Trustee | 15 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE HERRINGTON | Trustee | 02 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROGER SAINSBURY MRCVS | Trustee | 02 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.58k | £10.53k | £7.67k | £9.98k | £8.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.91k | £6.71k | £13.77k | £8.20k | £13.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 1. PREVENTING CRUELTY TOWARDS AND SUFFERING OF DOGS OF THE DACHSHUND BREED BY ADVANCING EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF DACHSHUNDS AND PROMOTING HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS DACHSHUNDS. 2. ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO DISEASES AND HEREDITARY DISORDERS OF DACHSHUNDS AND BY PROMOTING THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Fantails
Kencot
Oxfordshire
GL7 3QX
- Phone:
- 07850728506
- Email:
- info@dachshundhealth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window