LITTLEBOROUGH COACH HOUSE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a community resource in the form of preservation of a listed coach house; comprising a heritage centre, an art gallery where local artists can exhibit and sell their works and two function rooms which can be hired on an hourly basis and which provides the base for several local groups/societies enabling delivery of weekly / monthly / annual classes, events and exhibitions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Rochdale
Governance
- 04 December 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Fairley | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Carol Margaret Hirst | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
John Edward Cannell | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
ROBERT ORTON WILLIS | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jennifer Rose Kay | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Adrian Woodhead | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
John Butterworth | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Steven Moss | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
David Lloyd | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Ann Stott | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|||||||
JOHN FREDERICK KAY | Trustee | 21 October 2014 |
|
|||||||
TONY ROWELL | Trustee | 20 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Woodhead | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.34k | £34.39k | £35.54k | £40.19k | £47.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.40k | £20.54k | £44.73k | £46.75k | £46.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2024 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2024 | 261 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2023 | 253 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 September 2024 | 602 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 SEPTEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE TOWNSPEOPLE OF LITTLEBOROUGH IN THE COUNTY OF GREATER MANCHESTER AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE WHATEVER OF THE ENGLISH HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND LITTLEBOROUGH AFORESAID IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY BUILDING AS DEFINED IN SECTION 290(1) OF THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ACT 1971) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
MAINLY LITTLEBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Littleborough Coach House Trust
The Heritage Centre
Lodge Street
LITTLEBOROUGH
OL15 9AE
- Phone:
- 01706378481
- Email:
- m.j.pearson@me.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window