Accounts and annual returns KENT COUNTY RAYNET

Charity number: 1177899
Charity reporting is up to date (114 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 October 2024 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 22 October 2024 114 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 07 June 2024 343 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 07 June 2024 343 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 April 2022 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 01 April 2022 275 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 13 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window