Financial history THE DEVON BRANCH OF THE CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND CIO

Charity Number: 1175228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £61.83k £54.06k £57.80k £91.62k £34.13k
Total expenditure £71.00k £60.77k £67.88k £99.32k £58.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A