Trustees THE DEVON BRANCH OF THE CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND CIO
Charity Number: 1175228

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PHILLIP ANTHONY WILLIAM BRATBY | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
IVAN BUXTON | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA FRANCES BARTLEET | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Sarah Hall | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Grahame Bartleet | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Best | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Stephen James Crowther | Trustee | 10 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dale Hall | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.