SENHOUSE MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manage and run a museum for the benefit of the public and offer educational services to children and others, and create public events to inform the public about the Roman presence in west Cumbria. The museum offers free entry to all residents in the local post code area (CA15)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,586 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 12 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PETER RICHARD WILSON | Chair | 12 October 2017 |
|
|||||||
Eleanor Kingston | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||||
WILLIAM BERNARD GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
RACHEL MARGARET NEWMAN BA FSA | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
PETER MESSENGER | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.67k | £124.44k | £129.55k | £118.72k | £154.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.73k | £86.07k | £98.08k | £145.32k | £157.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.00k | £30.11k | £10.67k | N/A | £3.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC REGARDING THE ARCHAEOLOGY AND HISTORY OF THE ROMANO-BRITISH PERIOD IN GENERAL AND WEST CUMBRIA IN PARTICULAR BY: A) ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A PUBLIC MUSEUM WITHIN THE CIVIL PARISH OF MARYPORT; B) EXHIBITING THE NETHERHALL COLLECTION AND ANY OTHER DOCUMENTS, ARTEFACTS OR ITEMS OF INTEREST RELATING TO THE ROMANO-BRITISH ARCHAEOLOGY AND HISTORY IN GENERAL AND THE ARCHAEOLOGY AND HISTORY OF WEST CUMBRIA IN PARTICULAR; C) PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE ROMANO-BRITISH PERIOD IN GENERAL AND WEST CUMBRIA IN PARTICULAR AND DISSEMINATING AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SENHOUSE ROMAN MUSEUM
THE BATTERY
THE PROMENADE
MARYPORT
CA15 6JD
- Phone:
- 01900816168
- Email:
- info@senhousemuseum.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window