LAWYERS FOR PALESTINIAN HUMAN RIGHTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LPHR works on a range of key projects with the aim of protecting and promoting Palestinian human rights. We exclusively take a legal and human rights perspective in our work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 November 2017: Standard registration
- 20 June 2019: Funds received from 1142158 LAWYERS FOR PALESTINIAN HUMAN RIGHTS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stanley Michael Lynk | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jocelyn Elizabeth Hurndall | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Verity McKay | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIR GEOFFREY BINDMAN QC | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor William Schuyler Beakbane Bowring | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Tessa Gregory | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Nusrat Uddin | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
GERALDINE ISHERWOOD | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.44k | £27.50k | £68.41k | £75.39k | £69.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.40k | £30.57k | £49.05k | £51.32k | £71.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS, SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS AND OTHER INTERNATIONAL TREATIES AND LAWS IN THE MIDDLE EAST AND PARTICULARLY IN PALESTINE AND ISRAEL BY OBTAINING REDRESS FOR AND RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF ABUSE; RESEARCHING INTO AND MONITORING HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; PROVIDING RELATED TECHNICAL AND LEGAL ADVICE; CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; PROMOTING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF AND RESPECT AND SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS OF PALESTINIAN PEOPLE BY INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS. IN PROMOTING HUMAN RIGHTS AS AFORESAID THE CHARITY SHALL IN EVERY CASE ACT OBJECTIVELY, IMPARTIALLY AND EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
196 ELSENHAM STREET
LONDON
SW18 5NR
- Phone:
- 07949212795
- Email:
- lphr@live.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window