SHREWSBURY ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activity of the Charity is promotion of the Catholic religion in the Diocese of Shrewsbury, and any lawful charitable purpose including eduction, working with the disadvantaged for those of all faiths and none.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 July 2018: Standard registration
- 28 March 2024: Funds received from 1101866 ST CUTHBERT'S SOCIETY, USHAW
- DIOCESE OF SHREWSBURY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RT REV MARK DAVIES | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Rev MICHAEL GANNON | Trustee | 04 April 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev DAVID ROBERTS | Trustee | 04 April 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
SIMON GEARY | Trustee | 30 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev STEPHEN COONAN | Trustee | 02 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN THE DIOCESE OF SHREWSBURY IN SUCH WAYS BEING CHARITABLE AS THE BISHOP SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT AND FOR THE SERVICE AND SUPPORT WHETHER IN THE DIOCESE OR OUTSIDE THE DIOCESE IN SUCH WAYS AS AFORESAID OF ANY LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHETHER EDUCATIONAL OR OTHERWISE PROMOTED OR SUPPORTED BY THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT NO PART OF THE CHARITY PROPERTY NEED BE RETAINED OR SHALL BE TREATED AS PERMANENT ENDOWMENT WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2016.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Diocese of Shrewsbury
2 Park Road South
PRENTON
CH43 4UX
- Phone:
- 01516529855
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window