THE NIGHT SHELTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide overnight shelter in the form of a bed in a shared room, a hot evening meal, and washing facilities. Coordinate volunteers who provide meals, supervision and conversation during opening hours. Regular check in meetings with all beneficiaries to ensure they are accessing any other support options available. Occasional one off events or short term projects such as art sessions or talks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
Governance
- 20 September 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Kariuki | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victor Iringere | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
DIONNE RUSSELL | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.59k | £22.74k | £9.56k | £18.11k | £24.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.19k | £19.14k | £17.44k | £20.11k | £15.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED ON 11 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG ASYLUM SEEKERS, REFUGEES AND MIGRANTS IN COVENTRY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY PROVISION OF, OR ASSISTANCE WITH, THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, SUPPORT AND ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
311 STONEY STANTON ROAD
COVENTRY
CV6 5DS
- Phone:
- 02476664616
- Email:
- shelter@covpeacehouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window