Financial history Rotary Club of Southampton Solent Trust Fund

Charity number: 1174544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £43.12k £57.23k £47.15k £57.92k £73.02k
Total expenditure £57.16k £40.87k £50.58k £58.66k £41.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A