Financial history THE DAISY CHAIN PROJECT

Charity number: 1175163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £66.10k £83.72k £126.00k £126.00k £136.71k
Total expenditure £58.07k £74.02k £73.24k £99.35k £127.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £25.00k £10.00k N/A