MAHADEVI YOGA CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. preserve and protect the good health of the public by providing yoga sessions, principally (but not exclusively) to children and adults with special needs; and 2. advance the study and practice of yoga including (but not limited to) training future0001
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
- City Of London
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
- Redbridge
Governance
- 16 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason Gunn | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Akita | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claudine Sachi Muenger | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elina Maria Nupponen | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anais Hannah Saegesser | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.50k | £141.42k | £133.57k | £174.36k | £140.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.40k | £88.67k | £155.71k | £145.16k | £174.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.70k | £41.61k | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 21 July 2023 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 21 July 2023 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 April 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 21 April 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING YOGA SESSIONS, PRINCIPALLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) TO CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS; AND 2. TO ADVANCE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF YOGA INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) TRAINING FUTURE INSTRUCTORS BY PROVIDING CLASSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAHADEVI YOGA CENTRE
12 Eden Grove
LONDON
N7 8EQ
- Phone:
- 07772336719
- Email:
- info@mahadevicentre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window