BEHIND EVERY KICK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Delivering personal development and life skills training and opportunities to young people through affiliation with sport and mentoring.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Pollock | Chair | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amira Mohamed | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim Shaw | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.31k | £98.91k | £120.05k | £124.61k | £173.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.90k | £91.93k | £123.76k | £115.10k | £173.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 21 YEARS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: 1.DELIVERING PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AND LIFE SKILLS TRAINING 2.DELIVERING MENTORING SCHEMES AT SPORTS CLUBS WHICH BUILD SELF-ESTEEM, RESILIENCE, TIME MANAGEMENT SKILLS, AMBITION, COMMITMENT AND DISCIPLINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O DAVID POLLOCK
UNION DEVELOPMENT LIMITED
18 GREAT PORTLAND STREET
LONDON
W1W 8QP
- Phone:
- 07779302216
- Email:
- info@behindeverykick.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window