Accounts and annual returns THE ANDREW HARRIS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1174568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 01 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 31 July 2024 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 31 July 2024 92 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 21 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 12 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 21 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window