CRESSWELL PELE TOWER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cresswell Pele Tower was built by the Cresswell family in the 14th century. It is a Grade 11* Listed Building and Scheduled Monument. The Cresswell Pele Tower Project has set up a community and education focused project to investigate the Pele Tower and its environs and then conserve the tower and adjacent 18th century walled garden as a community resource for future generations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 06 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Hood | Chair | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rexie Fraser | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sasha Taylor | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Dodd | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Richardson | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Russell Haywood | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM LODGE | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARRY MEAD | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.24k | £316.42k | £399.48k | £85.74k | £183.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.40k | £29.59k | £53.45k | £54.62k | £58.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 June 2021 | 342 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 June 2021 | 342 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HERITAGE AND EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION AND PROMOTION OF CRESSWELL PELE TOWER TO ENABLE IT TO OPEN TO THE PUBLIC AND ENABLE THE EXPLORATION OF ITS LANDSCAPE THROUGH A COMMUNITY ARCHAEOLOGY PROJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 ST. BARTHOLOMEWS CLOSE
CRESSWELL
MORPETH
NE61 5JX
- Phone:
- 01670861180
- Email:
- bas.mead@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window