Financial history STEM WITHOUT BORDERS

Charity Number: 1181302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £181 £356 £299 £1.35k £396
Total expenditure £55 £55 £59 £57 £66
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A