Financial history SENGHENYDD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1174629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.08k £30.06k £27.83k £18.77k £14.98k
Total expenditure £26.82k £13.69k £18.85k £27.66k £29.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £21.00k £3.00k N/A N/A