Accounts and annual returns KIDS IN THE SPOTLIGHT

Charity number: 1181577
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 243 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 243 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 17 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 17 July 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2021 11 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 11 July 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2020 03 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 03 March 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2019 18 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 18 March 2020 On Time