THE SARASWATI SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust awards scholarships to support young women or girls wish to study science, in India, based in Kolkata
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- India
Governance
- 30 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOPHIE BAKER M.A | Chair | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sujata SEn | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
NATASHA WHITING | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
NIKHILESH BHATTACHARYA | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUJATA SEN | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANE CARLING | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2019 | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.03k | £4.90k | £6.69k | £1.12k | £1.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.58k | £3.88k | £2.53k | £3.43k | £8.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 13 March 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2019 | 13 March 2021 | 406 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2019 | 06 April 2021 | 430 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO YOUNG WOMEN AND GIRLS IN THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA, WITH A FOCUS ON KOLKATA, TO UNDERTAKE COURSES OF STUDY, TRAINING OR RESEARCH; AND 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG YOUNG WOMEN, GIRLS AND OTHER INDIVIDUALS OF NEED IN KOLKATA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Highgate West Hill
London
N66JS
LONDON
N6 6AS
- Phone:
- 07904409662
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window