STOKE TRAMPOLINE TRUST

Charity number: 1176906
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Trampolining & Gymnastics Club for Recreational and Competitive purposes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 February 2020

Total income: £11,164
Total expenditure: £16,858

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire
  • Stoke-on-trent City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 January 2018: CIO registration
  • 10 August 2021: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 10 August 2021: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • STOKE ELITE TRAMPOLINING CLUB (Previous name)
  • STOKE TRAMPOLINING AND GYMNASTICS CLUB (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/02/2019 01/02/2020
Total gross income £24.90k £11.16k
Total expenditure £37.67k £16.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 February 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 01 February 2020 17 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2020 17 October 2020 On Time
Annual return 01 February 2019 06 January 2020 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2019 06 January 2020 36 days late