BOHUNT SCHOOL WOKINGHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the association is to advance the education of pupils in the school. The association hold a number of fundraising events held during the year along with fundraising schemes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Wokingham
Governance
- 04 December 2018: Standard registration
- BSWCA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amit Shrivastava | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Patricia O'Grady | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Holford | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/03/2020 | 14/03/2021 | 14/03/2022 | 14/03/2023 | 14/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.21k | £1.70k | £6.68k | £5.48k | £5.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.14k | £5.51k | £258 | £3.41k | £13.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 March 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHEERLANDS ROAD
ARBORFIELD
WOKINGHAM
BERKS
RG2 9GB
- Phone:
- 01189076237
- Email:
- admin@bswca.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window