Trustees ST THOMAS JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH LONDON
Charity number: 1177726

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Geevarghese Thandayath Fr. | Chair | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Resmi Binoy | Trustee | 26 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rikku Varghese | Trustee | 26 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alen Siril | Trustee | 26 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Saji Kerambal Chacko | Trustee | 26 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shiji Varughese | Trustee | 26 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Riya Thukalil | Trustee | 26 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shyam Simon | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Binoy Jacob | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pradeep Cherian | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kakkassery Poulose | Trustee | 20 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Basil John | Trustee | 20 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Biju Jacob | Trustee | 20 January 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.