THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S WALSGRAVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the Christian faith. Pastoral and other mission based activities in Walsgrave, Coventry
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
Governance
- 07 September 2017: Standard registration
- ST MARY'S WALSGRAVE PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Bettles | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ekin | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Nigel Baker | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Norris Yuen Kuen Poon | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Phyllis Jean Hudson | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE HELEN BAKER | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GARY ALAN CROSHAW | Trustee | 01 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY PAUL THISTLEWOOD | Trustee | 01 April 1990 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.61k | £68.95k | £80.25k | £77.63k | £92.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.52k | £75.71k | £75.42k | £67.20k | £94.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 May 2024 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 May 2024 | 189 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 May 2024 | 554 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 May 2024 | 554 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HALL LANE
COVENTRY
CV2 2AW
- Phone:
- 02476618845
- Email:
- stmaryssowe@aol.com
- Website:
-
stmarys-walsgrave.org,uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window