Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S WALSGRAVE
Charity Number: 1174550

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Home | Trustee | 25 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Hamilton | Trustee | 25 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Venn | Trustee | 25 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lee Bettles | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ekin | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Nigel Baker | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Norris Yuen Kuen Poon | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE HELEN BAKER | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GARY ALAN CROSHAW | Trustee | 01 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY PAUL THISTLEWOOD | Trustee | 01 April 1990 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.