Accounts and annual returns CHARTER STREET MISSION, SUNDAY SCHOOL AND WORKING GIRLS' HOME (ORIGINALLY KNOWN AS CHARTER STREET RAGGED SCHOOL AND WORKING GIRLS HOME)

Charity number: 1175725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 February 2023 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 February 2023 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 March 2022 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 March 2022 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window