Trustees HARWICH ELECTRIC PALACE TRUST

Charity number: 1174807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sanja Bahun Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Loriana Jaconelli Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Wayne Michael Linge Trustee 08 January 2024
None on record
Billie Elizabeth Nugent Trustee 08 January 2024
None on record
Richard Henry Bench Trustee 20 September 2022
None on record
ANDREW KEITH FULLARTON Trustee 20 September 2022
None on record
Philip Hartwell Trustee 28 June 2021
None on record
DAVID TREVOR LOOSER Trustee 22 September 2017
None on record