REPATRIATION SERVICES TRUST (REST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Repatriation Services Trust (REST) aim is to assist with financial help and give support to bereaved families by repatriating their loved one(s) who have died abroad in sudden or tragic circumstances back home to Wales To continue the Trust with fundraising activities and donations. To recruit supporters of the Trust to sustain its purpose and ideals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 30 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul George Hannah | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN BASSETT MBA | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steven Bassett | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Bassett | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY BASSETT | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.49k | £5.43k | £4.34k | £50.40k | £11.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.35k | £4.83k | £6.72k | £5.21k | £21.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 09 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 09 February 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 177 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 March 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 12 March 2023 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 January 2022 | 352 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 23 January 2022 | 352 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST PEOPLE WHO HAVE NO MONETARY MEANS TO DO SO, TO REPATRIATE BACK TO WALES THE BODIES OF IMMEDIATE FAMILY MEMBERS STRANDED IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 TY DRAW PLACE
ROATH PARK
Cardiff
CF23 5HF
- Phone:
- 07903842602
- Website:
-
repatriationservicestrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window