CARE FOR THE PAW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer support for dogs living on the streets with homeless owners, dogs living in hostels with their owners, and dogs and owners who are accommodated with low level support. We provide dog food, dog coats, collars, leads, etc. But most importantly we provide free Vet care. We have Outreach Teams who take bags of items out to the dogs and owners, each week. We also provide Foster Care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 June 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Halton
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Warrington
- Wirral
Governance
- 19 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET HUGHES | Chair | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Clair Huddleston | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/06/2019 | 14/06/2020 | 14/06/2021 | 14/06/2022 | 14/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.45k | £13.37k | £12.61k | £13.36k | £10.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.80k | £12.21k | £12.70k | £15.08k | £10.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days | |
Annual return | 14 June 2023 | 04 April 2025 | 355 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 389 days | |
Annual return | 14 June 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 755 days | |
Annual return | 14 June 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 June 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 June 2020 | 27 May 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 June 2020 | 29 May 2021 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS, AND TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY PROVIDING ITEMS AND FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE, AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG HOMELESS PERSONS BY PROVIDING THEM WITH FREE ANIMAL FOOD AND OTHER ESSENTIAL ITEMS RELATING TO ADEQUATE CARE OF THEIR COMPANION ANIMALS AND FREE MEDICAL OR SURGICAL TREATMENT FOR SUCH ANIMALS, WHERE THEIR OWNERS ARE UNABLE TO AFFORD THE SERVICES OF A VETERINARY SURGEON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
157 Duke Street
Phoenix Foundation
Liverpool
L1 4JR
- Phone:
- 07597946343
- Email:
- janhughes200@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window